Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Wieslaw Krótki, O.M.I.

Bishop of Churchill-Baie d’Hudson, Manitoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1964 BornIstebna, Poland
8 Sep 198824.2Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
19 Jun 199026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
16 Feb 201348.7AppointedBishop of Churchill-Baie d’Hudson, Manitoba, Canada
30 May 201349.0Ordained BishopBishop of Churchill-Baie d’Hudson, Manitoba, Canada

MicroData Summary for Anthony Wieslaw Krótki:
Bishop Anthony Wieslaw Krótki O.M.I. (born ) Bishop of Churchill-Baie d’Hudson

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Churchill-Baie d’Hudson.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 23 Feb 2013
  • c34: CB, 21 Mar 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,797

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013