Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yosyf Milan, M.S.U.

Auxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)

Titular Bishop of Drusiliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1956 BornDobryany
8 Mar 198326.6ProfessedMember of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
9 May 198427.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
30 Dec 198428.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
16 Apr 200952.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
16 Apr 200952.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Drusiliana
18 Jun 200952.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Drusiliana

MicroData Summary for Yosyf Milan:
Bishop Yosyf Milan M.S.U. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archeparchy of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,190

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015