Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petro Kozak, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1911BornLysyn
26 Jun 193221.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
21 Sep 193524.4Solemn ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
25 Jul 193726.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
1983¹71.7Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
11 Dec 198473.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Petro Kozak
Bishop Petro Kozak C.SS.R. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,799
  • sole/c1: CB, 7 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 8 Jul 2016