Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Pietro Antonio Palma, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Avellino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1774³Born
22 Sep 179824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
13 Mar 184368.7SelectedBishop of Avellino, Italy
3 Apr 184368.7ConfirmedBishop of Avellino, Italy
23 Apr 184368.8Ordained BishopBishop of Avellino, Italy
12 Oct 184369.3DiedBishop of Avellino, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Pietro Antonio Palma
Bishop Giuseppe Pietro Antonio Palma O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Avellino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVieste
Ordained BishopSte. Marie in Transpontina, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 99
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast