Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Honoré Laborde

Deceased

Bishop of Blois, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1826Born
21 Dec 185024.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 187750.6SelectedBishop of Blois, France
25 Jun 187750.6ConfirmedBishop of Blois, France
24 Aug 187750.8Ordained BishopBishop of Blois, France
18 May 190780.5DiedBishop of Blois, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Honoré Laborde (VIAF: 304912978)
Bishop Charles-Honoré Laborde (born , died ) Bishop of Blois

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Nazaire
Ordained BishopS. Similien, Nantes, Diocese of Nantes

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 150
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017