Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Augustine Healy

Deceased

Bishop of Portland, Maine, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1830Born
10 Jun 185424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
12 Feb 187544.8AppointedBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
2 Jun 187545.1Ordained BishopBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
5 Aug 190070.3DiedBishop of Portland, Maine, USA

MicroData Summary for James Augustine Healy (VIAF: 45958813)
Bishop James Augustine Healy (born , died ) Bishop of Portland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMacon, GA, Diocese of Charleston, South Carolina
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Portland, Diocese of Portland, Maine

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 464
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Mar 2017