Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Kilian (Chiliano) Pflaum, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Ñuflo de Chávez

Titular Bishop of Iziriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1913BornLembach, Germany
11 Sep 193824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
16 Nov 195340.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ñuflo de Chávez, Bolivia
16 Nov 195340.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Iziriana
14 Feb 195440.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iziriana
18 Sep 197157.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Ñuflo de Chávez, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Jorge Kilian (Chiliano) Pflaum:
Bishop Jorge Kilian (Chiliano) Pflaum O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Ñuflo de Chávez

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015