Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Anasagasti Zulueta, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Caltadria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1910Born
19 Mar 193423.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
29 Jun 195342.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia
29 Jun 195342.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Caltadria
13 Sep 195342.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caltadria
17 Nov 198676.0RetiredVicar Apostolic of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia
26 Jul 199887.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Carlos Anasagasti Zulueta
Bishop Carlos Anasagasti Zulueta O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of El Beni o Beni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBermeo (Vizcaya), Spain

  • a priest for 64.3 years
  • a bishop for 44.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast