Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Soriani, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bisceglie


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Aug 1576AppointedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
2 Sep 1576Ordained BishopBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
25 Jun 1582DiedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Soriani:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Soriani O. Carm. (died ) Bishop of Bisceglie

  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013