Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Thomàs de Taxaquet

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1529¹Born
8 Nov 157748.8AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
24 Nov 157748.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
9 Jul 157849.5DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Thomàs de Taxaquet (VIAF: 77379878)
Bishop Miguel Thomàs de Taxaquet (born 1529, died ) Bishop of Lérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLluchmayor, Diocese of Mallorca
Ordained BishopMontserrat, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceLérida, Diocese of Lérida

  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 87, Number 533
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 212
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1577, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast