Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Agostino Campanile

Deceased

Bishop of Minori


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Aug 1567AppointedBishop of Minori, Italy
31 Aug 1567Ordained BishopBishop of Minori, Italy
4 Jul 1594DiedBishop of Minori, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Agostino Campanile:
Bishop Giovanni Agostino Campanile (died ) Bishop of Minori

  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 246
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 12, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013