Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Quero Turillo

Deceased

Bishop of Cefal¨


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1554¹BornJaÚn, Spain
18 Dec 159642.9AppointedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
30 May 159743.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
2 Sep 160551.6DiedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Quero Turillo:
Bishop Manuel Quero Turillo (died ) Bishop of Cefal¨

  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 146
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 163
  • b: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1500, Page 109, Number 692
  • ob/c2: CB, 2 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015