Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Gualandi

Deceased

Bishop of Cesena, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Mar 1588AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
25 Apr 1588Ordained BishopBishop of Cesena, Italy
11 Feb 1609DiedBishop of Cesena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Camillo Gualandi
Bishop Camillo Gualandi (died ) Bishop of Cesena

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSan Bartolomeo all’Isola, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 144
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 28, Number 131
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1588, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast