Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonello de Fulgure

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Nov 1585AppointedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
13 Dec 1585Ordained BishopBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
14 Aug 1590DiedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonello de Fulgure
Bishop Antonello de Fulgure (died ) Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAversa
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 109
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 24, Number 105
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1585, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast