Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Carafa

Deceased

Bishop of Boiano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
23 May 1567AppointedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
1 Jun 1567Ordained BishopBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
4 Jul 1572AppointedBishop of Boiano, Italy
29 Sep 1608DiedBishop of Boiano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Carafa
Bishop Carlo Carafa (died ) Bishop of Boiano

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 207, and Page 136
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 11, Number 28
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1567, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast