Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archangelo Cardinal de’ Bianchi (Blanca), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Teano, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Cesareo in Palatio

Prefect of the Congregation of the Index


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1516Born
16 Sep 156649.9AppointedBishop of Teano, Italy
21 Sep 156649.9Ordained BishopBishop of Teano, Italy
17 May 157053.6Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jul 157053.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Cesareo in Palatio
13 Sep 157255.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
18 Sep 157558.9ResignedBishop of Teano, Italy
18 Jan 158063.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Teano, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Archangelo de’ Bianchi (Blanca)
Archangelo Cardinal de’ Bianchi (Blanca) O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Teano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGambolo, Diocese of Vigevano
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Santa Sabina, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 13.3 years
  • a cardinal for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1570
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 311
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1566, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast