Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Bernardino Grandopoli

Deceased

Bishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Sep 1576AppointedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
4 Nov 1576Ordained BishopBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
1590²DiedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Bernardino Grandopoli
Bishop Giovanni Bernardino Grandopoli (died 1590) Bishop of Lettere (-Gragnano)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Barthelemy, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 227
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1576, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast