Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Monaco

Deceased

Bishop of Lucera


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Nov 1580AppointedBishop of Lucera, Italy
13 Nov 1580Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera, Italy
1581¹DiedBishop of Lucera, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Monaco:
Bishop Giulio Monaco Bishop of Lucera

  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 229
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013