Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Orsini

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1511¹Born
15 Aug 156655.6AppointedBishop of Strongoli, Italy
28 Aug 156655.6Ordained BishopBishop of Strongoli, Italy
23 Jan 156857.0AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
25 Jan 157665.0DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Orsini
Bishop Tommaso Orsini (born 1511, died ) Bishop of Foligno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFoligno, Diocese of Foligno
Ordained BishopS. Pierre in Montorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceFoligno, Diocese of Foligno
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Foligno, Diocese of Foligno

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 199, and Page 304
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 9, Number 17
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1566, Number 19
  • b: Treccani.it, 29 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast