Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Massimiliano Palumbara (Palombella)

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
17 May 1574AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
26 Sep 1574Ordained BishopArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
23 Jan 1607DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Massimiliano Palumbara (Palombella)
Archbishop Massimiliano Palumbara (Palombella) (died ) Archbishop of Benevento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopS. François ad Ripam, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 132
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1574, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast