Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Marchi

Deceased

Bishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Mar 1588AppointedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
27 Mar 1588³Ordained BishopBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece
1611¹DiedBishop of Santorini {Thira}, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Marchi
Bishop Antonio de Marchi (died 1611) Bishop of Santorini {Thira}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSan Bartolomeo all’Isola, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 291
  • ob/c2: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1588, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast