Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop NicolÚ Stizzia

Deceased

Bishop of Cefalý


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1542¹Born
1570¹28.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 May 159452.4AppointedBishop of Cefalý, Italy
30 May 159452.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalý, Italy
17 Feb 159654.1DiedBishop of Cefalý, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for NicolÚ Stizzia:
Bishop NicolÚ Stizzia (died ) Bishop of Cefalý

  • a priest for 26.1 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 146
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 33, Number 163
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 163

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013