Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Antonio Santorio

Deceased

Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jan 1573AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
Mar 1573²Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
28 Jul 1586AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
1588DiedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Santorio:
Archbishop Francesco Antonio Santorio Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 298
  • ob/c2: CB, 29 Sep 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013