Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bl. Paolo (Scipione) Cardinal Burali d’Arezzo, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1511²Born
25 Jan 155746.0EnteredMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
2 Feb 155847.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
5 Mar 155847.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of Clerics Regular
26 Mar 155847.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
23 Jul 156857.5AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
1 Aug 156857.5Ordained BishopBishop of Piacenza, Italy
17 May 157059.3Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 157059.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
19 Sep 157665.7AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
17 Jun 157867.4DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
8 Jun 1772Beatified

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Paolo (Scipione) Burali d’Arezzo (VIAF: 84751739)
Bl. Paolo (Scipione) Cardinal Burali d’Arezzo C.R. (born 1511, died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItri, Diocese of Gaeta
Ordained BishopS. Silvestro in Monte-Cavallo, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceArchiepiscopal Palace, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, S. Paolo Maggiore, Basilica, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Buried Place (Current)Purità Chapel, S. Paolo Maggiore, Basilica, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 20.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
  • a cardinal for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 275, and Page 255
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 13, Number 42
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1568, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast