Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Paolo Marincola

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Teano


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Sep 1575AppointedBishop of Teano, Italy
4 Mar 1576³Ordained BishopBishop of Teano, Italy
1588¹ResignedBishop of Teano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Paolo Marincola:
Bishop Giovanni Paolo Marincola Bishop Emeritus of Teano

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 311
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013