Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mario Bolognini

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1541¹Born
3 Jul 157938.5AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
5 Jul 1579³38.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
3 Oct 158847.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
7 Jan 159150.0AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
25 Feb 160564.1DiedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mario Bolognini
Archbishop Mario Bolognini (born 1541, died ) Archbishop of Salerno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaiazzo
Ordained BishopS. Barthelemy en l'ile, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 180, and Page 289
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 218
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1579, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast