Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea Minucci

Deceased

Archbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Dec 1567AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
15 Feb 1568Ordained BishopArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
1572²DiedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea Minucci
Archbishop Andrea Minucci (died 1572) Archbishop of Zadar (Zara)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPapal Sacristy, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1568, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast