Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José (Giuseppe) Esteve Juan (Stefano)

Deceased

Bishop of Orihuela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1550²Born
17 Mar 158636.2AppointedBishop of Vieste, Italy
Apr 1586²36.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vieste, Italy
1589¹39.0ResignedBishop of Vieste, Italy
12 Jan 159444.0AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
2 Nov 160353.8DiedBishop of Orihuela, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José (Giuseppe) Esteve Juan (Stefano) (VIAF: 77419216)
Bishop José (Giuseppe) Esteve Juan (Stefano) (born 1550, died ) Bishop of Orihuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia
Ordained BishopS. Jacques des Espagnols, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceAyora, Archdiocese of Valencia

  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 263, and Page 332
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 97, Number 610
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1586, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast