Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edgar de Jesús Garcia Gil

Bishop of Palmira, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1946 Born
28 Aug 197124.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cartago, Colombia
8 Jul 199245.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cali, Colombia
8 Jul 199245.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Forum Traiani
8 Sep 199245.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forum Traiani
28 Oct 200256.0AppointedBishop of Montelibano, Colombia
24 May 201063.6AppointedBishop of Palmira, Colombia
31 Jul 201063.7InstalledBishop of Palmira, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Edgar de Jesús Garcia Gil
Bishop Edgar de Jesús Garcia Gil (born ) Bishop of Palmira

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoldanillo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Palmira.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,980

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast