Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Cali

Archidioecesis Caliensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 20 June 1964
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 2,504 (967 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesiscali.org/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Arzobispal, Carrera 4 N. 7-17, Apartado 8924, Cali, Colombia
  • Telephone: (2)889.05.62
  • Fax: 883.79.80

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Cali
7 June 1910ErectedArchdiocese of Popayán Diocese of Cali (erected)
1 May 1927Territory LostDiocese of Cali
Diocese of Pasto
Prefecture Apostolic of Tumaco (erected)
14 November 1952Territory LostDiocese of Cali
Prefecture Apostolic of Tumaco
Vicariate Apostolic of Buenaventura (erected)
17 December 1952Territory LostDiocese of Cali
Archdiocese of Popayán
Diocese of Palmira (erected)
16 March 1962Territory LostDiocese of Cali Diocese of Cartago (erected)
Archdiocese of Cali
20 June 1964ElevatedDiocese of Cali Archdiocese of Cali
29 June 1966Territory LostArchdiocese of Cali
Diocese of Palmira
Diocese of Buga (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Cali
1950809,382821,40898.5%751231984,08717379249ap1951
1958894,891906,89198.7%91981894,73416768255ap1960
Archdiocese of Cali
19661,235,0001,250,00098.8%941051996,20613599366ap1967
1970895,000980,00091.3%851051904,7101501,00057ap1971
19761,190,0001,235,50096.3%981352335,1071791,01452ap1977
19801,197,0001,296,00092.4%88931816,61313485974ap1981
19901,667,7031,900,00087.8%113851988,42291051,02591ap1991
19991,981,7802,158,00091.8%1461302767,180151581,010128ap2000
20001,982,0002,294,69986.4%1461302767,181151581,020127ap2001
20011,982,2202,431,39081.5%1671302976,67417171814131ap2002
20021,982,3902,431,39081.5%1541416811,79917181814136ap2003
20031,924,6182,264,25685.0%1421462886,68217188781138ap2004
20042,086,2972,454,29785.0%1631523156,62317195790138ap2005
20062,215,0002,606,00085.0%1701393097,16817188803138ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 25 Apr 2013