Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Enrique Serpa Pérez

Bishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1942 Born
14 Jul 196826.3Ordained PriestPriest of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
13 Dec 200664.7AppointedBishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba
13 Jan 200764.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Jorge Enrique Serpa Pérez
Bishop Jorge Enrique Serpa Pérez (born ) Bishop of Pinar del Rio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Clara

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pinar del Rio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Dec 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,322

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast