Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Marie-Henri-Baptiste Rougé

Deceased

Bishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1910Born
9 Jul 193222.4Ordained PriestPriest
8 Nov 195949.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France
8 Nov 195949.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Gisipa
2 Feb 196049.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gisipa
20 Jun 196353.3SucceededBishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France
15 Jun 197767.3DiedBishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès), France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Marie-Henri-Baptiste Rougé
Bishop Pierre-Marie-Henri-Baptiste Rougé (born , died ) Bishop of Nîmes (-Uzès e Alès)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEspérenza

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast