Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eugène-Jean-Marie Polge

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1913BornBruay-sur-Escaut
29 Jun 193622.8Ordained PriestPriest
19 May 196551.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
19 May 196551.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thiava
30 Jun 196551.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thiava
25 Apr 196854.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
25 Apr 196854.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Curubis
25 Jun 197056.8SucceededArchbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
25 Apr 197864.6ResignedArchbishop of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France
21 Jul 199379.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison), France

MicroData Summary for Eugène-Jean-Marie Polge:
Archbishop Eugène-Jean-Marie Polge (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison)

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013