Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Antonio Lerma Nolasco

Bishop of Iztapalapa, México, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1945 Born
24 Dec 197126.4Ordained PriestPriest of Tepic, Nayarit, México
7 May 200963.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
7 May 200963.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Aulon
10 Jul 200964.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aulon
28 Sep 201974.2AppointedBishop of Iztapalapa, México, México
4 Nov 201974.3InstalledBishop of Iztapalapa, México, México

MicroData Summary for Jesús Antonio Lerma Nolasco
Bishop Jesús Antonio Lerma Nolasco (born ) Bishop of Iztapalapa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceXalisco, Diocese of Tepic, Nayarit
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, México, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Iztapalapa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,246
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Sep 2019
  • i: CB, 7 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 8 Oct 2019

Quantcast