Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás López Durán

Auxiliary Bishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla

Titular Bishop of Socia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1961 BornAtoyatempan
29 Jun 199130.5Ordained PriestPriest of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
6 Dec 201352.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
6 Dec 201352.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Socia
3 Mar 201453.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Socia

MicroData Summary for Tomás López Durán:
Bishop Tomás López Durán (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 6 Dec 2013
  • ob: CB, 13 Jan 2014
  • c2+: CB, 3 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 5 Mar 2014