Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Andrés Lira Rugarcía

Bishop of Matamoros, Tamaulipas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1965 BornPuebla
22 Feb 199125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
Feb 199832.5IncardinatedPriest of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
24 Feb 201145.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
24 Feb 201145.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Buxentum
12 Apr 201145.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buxentum
22 Sep 201651.1AppointedBishop of Matamoros, Tamaulipas, México

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Andrés Lira Rugarcía
Bishop Eugenio Andrés Lira Rugarcía (born ) Bishop of Matamoros

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Matamoros.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,036
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 22 Sep 2016