Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rogelio Esquivel Medina

Auxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District

Titular Bishop of Garriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1940 BornPeribán de Ramos
13 Sep 197030.2Ordained PriestPriest of México, Federal District
27 Jun 200161.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
27 Jun 200161.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Garriana
15 Aug 200161.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Garriana

MicroData Summary for Rogelio Esquivel Medina:
Bishop Rogelio Esquivel Medina (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of México

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of México.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013