Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Sandoval Sandoval, M.N.M.

Bishop of Autlán, Jalisco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1947 Born
2 Jul 197427.2Ordained PriestPriest of Misioneros de la Natividad de María
4 Jan 200557.7AppointedBishop of Tarahumara, Chihuahua, México
9 Mar 200557.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tarahumara, Chihuahua, México
23 Nov 201568.6AppointedBishop of Autlán, Jalisco, México
21 Jan 201668.7InstalledBishop of Autlán, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Rafael Sandoval Sandoval
Bishop Rafael Sandoval Sandoval M.N.M. (born ) Bishop of Autlán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuáscaro Michoacán

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Autlán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: JPG
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,830
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2015
  • i: CB, 23 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017