Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Vargas Peña

Bishop of Xochimilco, México, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1946 Born
12 Oct 197326.8Ordained PriestPriest of San Luis Potosí, México
22 Jun 201063.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
22 Jun 201063.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Utimmira
30 Jul 201063.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utimmira
28 Sep 201972.8AppointedBishop of Xochimilco, México, México
5 Nov 201972.9InstalledBishop of Xochimilco, México, México

MicroData Summary for Andrés Vargas Peña
Bishop Andrés Vargas Peña (born ) Bishop of Xochimilco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilla de la Paz, Archdiocese of San Luis Potosí
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, México, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Xochimilco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,768
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Sep 2019
  • i: CB, 7 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast