Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Jesús Martínez Zepeda

Bishop of Irapuato, Guanajuato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1941 BornTepeji del Río
28 Sep 196827.1Ordained PriestPriest of México, Federal District
11 Mar 199755.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
11 Mar 199755.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Naratcata
12 Apr 199755.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Naratcata
3 Jan 200462.3AppointedBishop of Irapuato, Guanajuato, México

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús Martínez Zepeda:
Bishop José de Jesús Martínez Zepeda (born ) Bishop of Irapuato

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Irapuato.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 12,992

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Aug 2014