Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Briseño Arch, O.A.R.

Bishop of Veracruz, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1960 Born
13 Oct 198525.2ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
7 Nov 198525.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Augustinian Recollects
27 Sep 198626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
20 May 200645.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
20 May 200645.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Trecalae
17 Jun 200645.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trecalae
12 Nov 201858.3AppointedBishop of Veracruz, México

MicroData Summary for Carlos Briseño Arch
Bishop Carlos Briseño Arch O.A.R. (born ) Bishop of Veracruz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMexico City, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, Mexico City, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Veracruz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 May 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,168
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast