Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José María González y Valencia

Deceased

Archbishop of Durango, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1884Born
28 Oct 190723.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Feb 192237.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Durango, México
10 Feb 192237.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Siunia
11 Jun 192237.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Siunia
24 Mar 192439.4AppointedArchbishop of Durango, México
11 Apr 192439.5InstalledArchbishop of Durango, México
28 Jan 195974.3DiedArchbishop of Durango, México

MicroData Summary for José María González y Valencia
Archbishop José María González y Valencia (born , died ) Archbishop of Durango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCotija

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast