Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Andrés Corral Arredondo

Deceased

Bishop of Parral, Chihuahua, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1946Born
22 Nov 197023.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 198942.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Durango, México
16 Jan 198942.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cincari
22 Feb 198942.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cincari
11 Jul 199245.6AppointedBishop of Parral, Chihuahua, México
24 Dec 201165.0DiedBishop of Parral, Chihuahua, México

MicroData Summary for José Andrés Corral Arredondo
Bishop José Andrés Corral Arredondo (born , died ) Bishop of Parral

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColoradas

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,343
  • d: CB, 24 Dec 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018