Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rosendo Huesca Pacheco

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1932Born
28 Oct 195624.6Ordained PriestPriest of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
30 May 197038.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
30 May 197038.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Themisonium
24 Aug 197038.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Themisonium
28 Sep 197745.5AppointedArchbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
26 Nov 197745.7InstalledArchbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
5 Feb 200976.9RetiredArchbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
25 Nov 201785.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México

MicroData Summary for Rosendo Huesca Pacheco
Archbishop Rosendo Huesca Pacheco (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEjutla
Ordained BishopPuebla de los Ángeles, Archdiocese of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 47.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2009
  • d: CB, 25 Nov 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 18, Number 940

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast