Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Boleslaus Ledvina

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Corpus Christi, Texas

Titular Bishop of Pitanae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1868BornEvansville, IN
18 Mar 189324.4Ordained PriestPriest of Vincennes, Indiana, USA
30 Apr 192152.5AppointedBishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
14 Jun 192152.6Ordained BishopBishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
12 Jul 192152.7InstalledBishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
15 Mar 194980.4RetiredBishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
15 Mar 194980.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Pitanae
15 Dec 195284.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Boleslaus Ledvina:
Bishop Emmanuel Boleslaus Ledvina (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Corpus Christi

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013