Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Theodore Espelage, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gallup, New Mexico

Titular Bishop of Penafiel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1892BornCincinnati, OH
16 May 191826.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
20 Jul 194048.4AppointedBishop of Gallup, New Mexico, USA
9 Oct 194048.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gallup, New Mexico, USA
25 Aug 196977.5RetiredBishop of Gallup, New Mexico, USA
25 Aug 196977.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Penafiel
19 Feb 197179.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Gallup, New Mexico, USA

MicroData Summary for Bernard Theodore Espelage:
Bishop Bernard Theodore Espelage O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gallup

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1940, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013