Catholic-Hierarchy DC

John Francis Cardinal O’Hara, C.S.C. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1888BornAnn Arbor, MI
9 Sep 191628.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
11 Dec 193951.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Military, USA
11 Dec 193951.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Mylasa
15 Jan 194051.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mylasa
10 Mar 194556.8AppointedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
8 May 194557.0InstalledBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
23 Nov 195163.5AppointedArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
15 Dec 195870.6Elevated to Cardinal
15 Dec 195870.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio
28 Aug 196072.3DiedArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for John Francis O’Hara:
John Francis Cardinal O’Hara C.S.C. (born , died ) Archbishop of Philadelphia

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
  • a cardinal for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015