Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Paul Rastouil

Deceased

Bishop of Limoges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1884BornBonnieux
29 Jun 190824.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Oct 193854.5AppointedBishop of Limoges, France
21 Dec 193854.6Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
7 Apr 196681.9DiedBishop of Limoges, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Paul Rastouil:
Bishop Louis-Paul Rastouil (born , died ) Bishop of Limoges

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013