Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne-Auguste-Germain Loosdregt, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Vientiane, Laos

Titular Bishop of Amaura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1908Born
16 Jul 193325.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
13 Mar 195243.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Vientiane, Laos
13 Mar 195243.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Amaura
30 Jun 195244.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amaura
22 May 197567.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Vientiane, Laos
13 Nov 198072.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Vientiane, Laos

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Auguste-Germain Loosdregt
Bishop Etienne-Auguste-Germain Loosdregt O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Vientiane

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Pol sur-Mer, France

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018