Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Bolognese

Deceased

Bishop of Marsi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1742BornChieti
21 Sep 176523.0Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 179755.1SelectedBishop of Marsi, Italy
18 Dec 179755.2ConfirmedBishop of Marsi, Italy
21 Dec 179755.2Ordained BishopBishop of Marsi, Italy
28 Dec 179755.2InstalledBishop of Marsi, Italy
17 Mar 180360.5DiedBishop of Marsi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Bolognese
Bishop Giuseppe Bolognese (born , died ) Bishop of Marsi

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 277
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016